Committee on Economic, Social and Cultural Rights: 2020 elections
Date
14 September 2020
LOCATION
New York
The terms of service of half of the current members of the Committee on Economic, Social and Cultural Rights were set to expire on 31 December 2020. A postponed election for those seats took place on 14 September 2020 in New York, (ECOSOC).
Results
The individuals elected to fill the positions on the Committee were:
Name | State | Term expires 31 December |
---|---|---|
Mr. Mohamed Ezzeldin ABDEL-MONEIM (re-elected) | Egypt | 2024 |
Mr. Nadir ADILOV | Azerbaijan | 2024 |
Mr. Mohammed AMARTI | Morocco | 2024 |
Ms. Laura-Maria CRACIUNEAN-TATU (re-elected) | Romania | 2024 |
Mr. Mikel MANCISIDOR (re-elected) | Spain | 2024 |
Mr. Seree NONTHASOOT | Thailand | 2024 |
Ms. Lydia Carmelita RAVENBERG (re-elected) | Suriname | 2024 |
Mr. Yongxian SHEN | China | 2024 |
Mr. Michael WINDFUHR (re-elected) | Germany | 2024 |
Further information
Note verbale
African States: English | Français | Español
Asian States: English | Français
Western Europe and Other States: English | Français | Español
Latin American and the Caribbean States: English | Français | Español
Eastern Europe States: English | Français
Annex
Annex I: English | Français | Español
Annex II: English | Français | Español
Annex III: English | Français | Español
Annex IV: English | Français | Español
Annex V: English | Français | Español
The current members of the Committee on Social Economic and Cultural Rights and their terms of office are (as of 1 January 2019):
Name | Nationality | Term expires |
---|---|---|
Mr. Aslan ABASHIDZE | Russian Federation | 31.12.2022 |
Mr. Mohamed Ezzeldin ABDEL-MONEIM | Egypt | 31.12.2020 |
Mr. Asraf Ally CAUNHYE | Mauritius | 31.12.2022 |
Mr. Shiqiu CHEN (Vice-Chair) | China | 31.12.2020 |
Ms. Laura-Maria CRACIUNEAN-TATU (Vice-Chair) | Romania | 31.12.2020 |
Mr. Peters Sunday Omologbe EMUZE | Nigeria | 31.12.2022 |
Mr. Ludovic HENNEBEL* | Belgium | 31.12.2022 |
Mr. Zdzislaw KEDZIA | Poland | 31.12.2020 |
Ms. Karla Vanessa LEMUS DE VÁSQUEZ | El Salvador | 31.12.2022 |
Ms. Sandra LIEBENBERG (Vice-Chair) | South Africa | 31.12.2020 |
Mr. Mikel MANCISIDOR | Spain | 31.12.2020 |
Ms. Lydia Carmelita RAVENBERG | Suriname | 31.12.2020 |
Ms. Preeti SARAN | India | 31.12.2022 |
Ms. Heisoo SHIN | Republic of Korea | 31.12.2022 |
Mr. Rodrigo UPRIMNY | Colombia | 31.12.2022 |
Mr. Michael WINDFUHR | Germany | 31.12.2020 |
Mr. Renato ZERBINI RIBEIRO LEÃO (Chair) | Brazil | 31.12.2022 |
* effective 21 July 2020, following the resignation of Olivier De Schutter effective 1 May 2020
In accordance with ECOSOC Resolution 1985/17 (paragraph (b), in regard to the composition of the Committee, due consideration must be given to equitable geographical distribution and to the representation of different forms of social and legal systems.
Accordingly, seats on the Committee are allocated on the basis of regional groupings as follows.
Region | Name | State |
---|---|---|
African States | Mr. Mohamad Ezzeldine Abdel-Moneim | Egypt |
Mr. Mohammed Amarti | Morocco | |
Ms. Sandra LIEBENBERG | South Africa | |
Ms. Fatimata-Binta Victoire Dah Diallo (WITHDRAWN) | Burkina Faso | |
Asian States | Mr. Seree Nonthasoot | Thailand |
Mr. Yongxiang Shen | China | |
Western Europe and Other States | Mr. Michael Windfuhr | Germany |
Mr. Mikel Mancisidor English | Español |
Spain | |
Ms. Hilal Elver | Turkey | |
Latin American and the Caribbean States | Ms. Lydia Carmelita Ravenberg | Suriname |
Eastern Europe States | Ms. Laura Maria Crăciunean –Tatu | Romania |
Mr. Nadir Adilov | Azerbaijan |